Bank of America, N.A. v. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.,
Defendant: Daisey Trust, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.,
Counter Claimant: Daisey Trust
Case Number: 2:2016cv00467
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER approving ECF No. 94 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims against Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners' Association. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on its first claim for relief and on Daisy Trust's counterclaims (ECF No. 77 ) is granted. Daisy Trust's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 79 ) is denied. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Associations motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 78 ) is granted in part and denied in part : It is granted with respect to Plaintiff's second and third claims for relief. It is denied as to the first claim for relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 82 Stipulation : Responses to ECF Nos. 77 , 78 , 79 Motions for Summary Judgment due by 2/22/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Joint Status Report. Proposed Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Motion to Stay Case; action temporarily stayed until resolution of the certified question in Nev. S. Ct. Case No. 72931; parties to file a status report within 5 days from such resolution; denying without prejudice ECF No. 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and may be refiled within 30 days from Supreme Court decision. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting ECF No. 52 Stipulation to Extend the Date for Daisey Trust to file its response to ECF No. 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Daisey Trust's response due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw. Attorney H. Sunny Jeong withdrawn from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.,
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.,
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Daisey Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisey Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association
Represented By: J. William Ebert
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Represented By: Hyungseon S. Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?