Bank of America, N.A. v. Mesa Verde Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Mesa Verde Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00498
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting 138 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Replies due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 116 BANA's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 126 BANA's motion to file supplemental authorities be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 122 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 116 Motion to Amend/Correct. Replies due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting 113 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven T. Loizzi, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Jesse A. Ransom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying SFR's 88 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and BANA's 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The HOA's 92 Motion for Summary Judgment and SFR's 94 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 95 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Brett M Coombs terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 83 Status Report. The stay in this case is LIFTED. The parties shall file no later than 6/20/2017 a joint statement with a schedule for this case to proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 78 Motion to Stay Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by 4/11/17, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting in part 79 Motion to Extend Time. ( Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2017., Motions due by 6/5/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 63 SFR's motion to certify be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting SFR's ECF No. 58 Motion for Leave to File an Opposition; granting in part and denying in part SFR's ECF No. 57 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 59 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Siria L. Gutierrez withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. In light of 70 the amended stipulation, 69 the stipulation is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Miles N Clark terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 50 Motion for Protective Order and for Sanctions. To the extent counsel cannot agree among themselves as to the amount of sanctions that should be paid, Plaintiff shall file a Motion for the Calculation of Sanctions no later than 11/2/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Take Certain Deposition Outside the Close of Discovery and to Stay Dispositive Motion Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Remove Attorney Donna M. Wittig from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Because the motion and memorandum for non-monetary status 44 46 fail to comply with the page limitations established in the local rules, they are hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/6/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Defendant SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC.'s 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall post a security bond in the amount of $500 within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Mesa Verde Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Verde Homeowners Association
Represented By: Kaleb D. Anderson
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Represented By: Siria L. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?