Geer v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Jamia M. Geer
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv00542
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 33 Motion; ORDER denying 41 Report and Recommendation; ORDER granting 29 Motion to Remand. This case is remanded to the Administrative Law Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2019.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Instructing Clerk's Office to substitute Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amy A. Feliciano withdrawn from the case. Plaintiff shall have until 3/27/2017 to have new counsel file a notice of appearance or to proceed pro se. Plaintiff shall have until 4/26/2017 to file a motion to remand and/or reverse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend Time. Motion for reversal and/or remand due by 2/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Remand and/or for Reversal due by 1/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Vacate. Motion for Reversal and/or remand due by 12/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a motion to remand by 11/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail to: (1) Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear St., Suite 899, San Francisco, California 94105-1545 ; and (2) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 4400, Washington, D.C. 20530. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geer v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamia M. Geer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?