U.S. Bank N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,
Case Number: 2:2016cv00576
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER to Release Bond re 27 Certificate of Cash Deposit. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that 113 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 111 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 118 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that SFR shall file a status report within fourteen (14) days of this Order stating how it intends to proceed on its slander of title claim. Failure to file a status report by this deadline will result in the Court dismissing this claim with prejudice and closing the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 119 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply Re: 111 and 113 Motions for Summary Judgment (Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/20/2018.), and Reply re 118 Motion to Strike, (Replies due by 8/20/2018). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. The Court STRIKES Docket No. 103 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting ECF No. 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Patrick James Davis withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that with respect to 93 Order to Show Cause, the Court hereby imposes a fine of $200 on Mr. Davis, a fine of $100 on Mr. Nitz, and a fine of $100 on Mr. Smith. Those fines are personal to each attorney. Payment of these fines shall be made to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court" within seven days of the issuance of this order. In addition, Mr. Davis, Mr. Nitz, and Mr. Smith shall pay SFR for their attorneys' fees and costs incurred as a result of the above con duct. The Court encourages the parties to confer on an amount of fees and costs to be paid. To the extent they cannot agree, SFR may file a "Motion to Calculate Fees and Costs" that includes proper documentation of the amounts for which it seeks to recover. Mr. Davis shall read the Local Rules in their entirety and shall file a declaration so certifying within 14 days of the issuance of this order. In all other respects, the order to show cause is discharged.FURTHER ORDERED that [84 ] U.S. Bank's Motion to Reopen Discovery is GRANTED as outlined in Section III.FURTHER ORDERED that 79 SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Re: 84 Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend the Deadline to File Motions for Summary Judgment. The Court hereby ORDERS SFR to file a response to the motion by January 11, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Remove Attorneys J. William Ebert and David Markman from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA, 832 F.3d 1154 (9th Cir. 2016). Once exhaustion occurs, any party may move to lift the stay. Until that time, all proceedings in this action are stayed. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, shall care for, preserve, and maintain the property located at 2812 Whisper Lane, Henderson, NV 89074 (the "Property").FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning on August 1, 2017, the parties must file a joint status report updating the Co urt on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. FURTHER ORDERED that this Order does not prevent the parties from continuing to engage in settlement conference negotiations with the assistance of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. The Court SETS a telephonic hearing for 9:00 a.m. on 3/21/2017. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that 49 Motion to be Excused from the Settlement Conference is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that no later than November 1, 2016, the parties shall file either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; (2) a motion or stipulation to stay discovery addressing the pertinent standards; or (3) a joint status report otherwise explaining why the parties do not believe a proposed discovery plan should be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 7 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Aaron D Lancaster
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?