Bank of America, N.A. v. Lamplight Village at Centennial Springs Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Lamplight Village at Centennial Springs Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00582
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation; Instructions due by 5/6/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Plaintiff to file a status report, no later than February 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Re: 37 Minute Order. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the HOA with the minute order issued at Docket No. 37, and shall file a status report by February 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STAYING CASE pending exhaustion of all appeals and DENYING all pending motions. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. BANA shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 after entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Lamplight Village at Centennial Springs Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamplight Village at Centennial Springs Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?