Middleton v. Citibank, N.A. Inc.

Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00622
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 84 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. All Outstanding Motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Substitute Attorney Ballard Spahr LLP. Attorney Shane P Gale and Sherry A Moore terminated.; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 74 ORDER that the 60 Writ Error and the 69 Notice by Court Order are STRICKEN from the docket as improper documents.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff files ANY other such documents in this record, his case may be dismissed with prejudice as a sanction for seeking to usurp this Courts inherent authority and for perpetuating a fraud on the Court and the parties in this action. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 44 ORDER denying 40 Request to Recuse., Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend Time; Motions due by 2/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER that the parties are to file no later than 7/7/2017 either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Serve Defendants at Their Expense is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 08/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER denying ECF No. 4 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER granting 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to file the complaint; dismissing the complaint with leave to amend; giving Plaintiff to 5/20/2016 to file amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Citibank, N.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?