Bank of America, N.A. v. Madeira Canyon Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Madeira Canyon Homeowners' Association, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00656
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Continuing Stay re: 73 Status Report and 60 Order - Staying Case. Status Report due in 90 days. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Stay of Litigation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the stay. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. shall post a cost bond of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 with the Clerk of Court within seven days of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 05/03/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Madeira Canyon Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeira Canyon Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?