Nye v. Burberry Limited
Plaintiff: Brett Nye
Defendant: Burberry Limited
Case Number: 2:2016cv00702
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 76 Stipulation to Vacate All Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 63 Motion; The parties are ordered to submit a revised scheduling order within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Stay.; denying as moot 35 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due 21 days from entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nye v. Burberry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burberry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Nye
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?