Bank of America, N.A., v. Desert Pine Villas Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Desert Pine Villas Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00725
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT the clerk of court close this matter, as all pending claims for relief have been resolved. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the instant 59 stipulation be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 41 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 79 SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.< br>IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 69 SFR's motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 SFR's motion to certify a question of law to Nevada's Supreme Court be, and the same h ereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 BANA's claims for breach of NRS 116.1113 and wrongful foreclosure against the HOA and Alessi be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED as unexhausted, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 BANA's claim for injunctive relief against SFR be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 41 , 79 Motions for Summary Judgment and 80 Joinder (First Request). Replies due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 78 the second joint motion to extend time be, and the same hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 83 the first stipulation for extension of time be, and the same hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying 81 Stipulation to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. The parties' stipulation to stay 75 is hereby DENIED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 46 Motion for Protective Order. SFR may only inquire about the topics listed supra at 4:8-4:15. Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) designee shall appear for the deposition in Dallas, Texas by videoconference. Plaintiff's counsel may choose to participate from either Las Vegas or Dallas. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions, 47 , is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying 42 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 46 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. No later than 12/12/2016 Defendant SFR may file a sur-reply addressing only the arguments raised by Plaintiff in its reply regarding the denial of the Bourne Valley petition for rehearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the e xtent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. On November 4, 2016, the Ninth Circuit denied counsel for Bourne Valley's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. See Case No. 15-15233, D.C. No. 2:13-cv-00649-JCM-GWF. The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to submit supplemental briefing discussing whether this recent development moots the pending motion to stay, no later than November 16, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation To Extend Time To file Response To Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation To Extend Time to File Response to Motion For Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE 42 Defendant's Joint Emergency Motion to Stay Briefing and/or Litigation. A response to this motion must be filed no later than October 5, 2016. Any reply must be filed no later than October 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 10/3/2016 to correct text - (DL).
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and striking 36 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 25 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for Security Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 07/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A., v. Desert Pine Villas Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Pine Villas Homeowners Association
Represented By: Robert L English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?