My Home Now, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: My Home Now, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and US Bank Trust NA
Case Number: 2:2016cv00727
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 99 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED ORDER Re: 94 Order. Parties shall have thirty (30) days from the date of remand to file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USCA - JM) Modified to include distribution on 12/27/2019 (JM).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that the Court's prior Order, (ECF No. 84 ), is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file renewed dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/18/2019., Case reopened. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USCA - JM)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Chase's Response to the Second Amended Complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 3/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment.; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment.; Amended Complaint deadline: 2/27/2017. Plaintiff's quiet title claim against Defendant is dismissed with prejudice . Plaintiff's slander of title and breach of contract claims against Defendant are dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 40 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 23 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file an amended discovery plan by June 29, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISCHARGING 17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Home Now, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Home Now, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?