U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool1, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00741
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Stipulation for Dismissal without prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order by 12/3/2020. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of these claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 56 plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.s motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 56) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 57 defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLCs motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLCs request to expunge lis pendens is GRANTED. Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is ordered to record a copy of this order with the Clark County Recorder by 11/6/2020. This order has the same effect as an expungement of the original notice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Court therefore ORDERS that, absent leave for an extension being granted, the response to a discovery motion shall be filed within 4 days of the service of that motion and any reply shall be filed within 2 days of the service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. I ORDER that the stay in this case is lifted for all purposes. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/1/2019.= (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that 40 plaintiff Bank of America's Motion to Lift Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 29 Motion to Lift Stay is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the proceedings in the United States Supreme Court in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 350 Durango 104 v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Remove Attorney Trella N. McLean from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the party challenging Chapter 116's constitutionality in each of these cases must serve the Nevada Attorney General with the complaint, motion, or other filing that calls into question Chapter 116's constitutionality, and shall file proof of compliance within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Aaron D Lancaster
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?