Bank of America, N.A. v. Nevada Trails II Community Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Daisy Trust and Nevada Trails II Community Association, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Counter Claimant: Daisy Trust
Case Number: 2:2016cv00880
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 32 Daisy Trust's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 34 the HOA's motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for su mmary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 35 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 26 the parties' Stipulation and Proposed Order is NOT APPROVED andis DENIED. The Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline 30 is GRANTED to the extent that the parties shall have until 5/5/2017, to file any dispositive motions. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation to Withdraw 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Nevada Trails II Community Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Trails II Community Association, Inc.
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Daisy Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?