Old Republic Insurance Company v. City Plan Development, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Old Republic Insurance Company
Defendant: City Plan Development, Inc., Ernesto J Savino and Cynthia Wilson
Counter Claimant: City Plan Development, Inc. and Ernesto J Savino
Counter Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00903
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 92 plaintiff's motion for sanctions be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 130 defendant's motion for attorney's fees be, and the same here by is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 143 plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 147 defendant's motion for leave to file a surreply be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 113 the parties' unopposed motion to continue calendar call be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare an appropriate judgment and submit it to the court forthwith for signature. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. The Court INSTRUCTS the Clerk's Office to unseal the documents in Docket No. 131 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER TEMPORARILY UNSEALING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Katherine Eismann - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 122 Motion for In Camera Review of Briefing on Settlement Documents. IT IS ORDERED that the Parties to submit their briefing documents to the undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office for in camera review, no later than 8/30/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting 120 Stipulated Motion to Continue Briefing Deadline re Settlement Agreement. ( Brief due by 8/28/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 118 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Deadline re Settlement Agreement. ( Brief due by 8/14/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 114 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing. (Bench Trial reset for 11/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan., Calendar Call set for 11/8/2017 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 78 defendants' motion be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 109 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re 106 Settlement Conference. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that the sealed portions of the audio shall be unsealed by the Clerk for the limited purpose of providing a copy of the audio as requested by Defense counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: ECRO - ADR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Denying 97 Motion to Strike Declaration as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying 104 Motion to set status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation to Continue Deadline re 97 MOTION to Strike Declaration re: 95 Response to Motion. (Replies due by 5/12/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this action's present venue is appropriate, and Nevada law shall apply to the issues in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file that complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 defendants' motion to dismiss, be and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulated Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule in Response to Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff Old Republic Insurance Company to file its response to 60 the Court's Order (currentl y due 11/30/16) is continued to 12/30/16. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have seven days thereafter to file a response. No reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulated Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule re 60 Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff Old Republic Insurance Company to file its response to 60 the Court's Order is continued to 11/30/16. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have seven days thereafter to file a response. No reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulated Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule re 60 Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff Old Republic Insurance Company to file its response to 60 the Court's Order is continued to 11/16/16. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have seven days thereafter to file a response. No reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff Old Republic is ORDERED to show cause why this case should not be transferred to a proper venue in Pennsylvania or Wisconsin. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have fourt een days from the entry of this order to file briefs and documentation necessary for responding to this courts order. Defendant shall have seven days thereafter to file a response. No reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Defendants' 49 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED Discovery due by 11/21/2016. Motions due by 12/21/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 07/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic Insurance Company v. City Plan Development, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: City Plan Development, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ernesto J Savino
Represented By: Michael C Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Plan Development, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto J Savino
Represented By: Michael C Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles W. Bennion
Represented By: Patrick Francis Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles W. Bennion
Represented By: Patrick Francis Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?