Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C. v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.
Defendant: Bureau Of Land Management, Lake Mead National Recreation Area, Las Vegas Field Office, Bureau of Land Management, National Park Service, Nevada State Office for the Bureau of Land Management, Southern Nevada District Office for the Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv00932
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery for Good Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' 23 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is Denied. The parties may submit a revised proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that sets forth specific dates for discovery and all rela ted deadlines. If the parties desire to stay discovery pending a decision on Defendants' motion to dismiss, they may file a motion to stay discovery supported by good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 08/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Sean C. Duffy for United States Department of the Interior and for United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C. v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Angela J Lizada
Represented By: Andrew K. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau Of Land Management
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Mead National Recreation Area
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Field Office, Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada State Office for the Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Nevada District Office for the Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?