The PrivateBank and Trust Company v. Cobra Thermosolar Plants, Inc.
Plaintiff: The PrivateBank and Trust Company
Defendant: Cobra Thermosolar Plants, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00983
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Respond to Discovery. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time. Cobra Thermosolar Plants, Inc. answer due 10/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation. The Parties agree and stipulate that Defendant shall have an open extension to file a response to the Complaint filed on May 2, 2016, to allow the Parties an opportunity to resolve the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The PrivateBank and Trust Company v. Cobra Thermosolar Plants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobra Thermosolar Plants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The PrivateBank and Trust Company
Represented By: Shan D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?