Bank of America, N.A. v. South Valley Ranch Community Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Hitchen Post Dr. Trust, Homeowner Association Services, Inc. and South Valley Ranch Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01013
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 50 Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Defendant South Valley Ranch Community Association's Motion for Summary Jud gment is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and against Defendants South Valley Ranch Community Association, Homeowner Association Services, Inc., and Defendant/Counterclaimant Hitchen Post Dr. Trust. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 46 Defendant Hitchen Post Dr. Trust's Motion to Lift Stay is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that stipulations, motions to modify the discovery plan and scheduling order, or in the absence of such stipulations or motions, dispositive motions are due within forty-five (45) days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Geisendorf terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael F. Bohn terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that 19 Defendant Homeowner Association Services, Inc.'s answer be STRICKEN. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that HASI must retain a new attorney and that attorney must file a notice of appearance by 5/17/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 30 attorney Wolfe Thompson's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Homeowner Association Services, Inc. is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Thompson must serve a copy of this order on Defendant Homeowner Associat ion Services, Inc. and must file proof of that service by 3/27/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 4/10/17, Defendant Homeowner Association Services, Inc. must retain a new attorney and that attorney must file a notice of appearance in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Miles N Clark terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 08/04/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. South Valley Ranch Community Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitchen Post Dr. Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Valley Ranch Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?