United States of America v. Derrico
Plaintiff: United Sates of America
Defendant: Derrick Derrico
Case Number: 2:2016cv01023
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Default of Student Loan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Joint Status Report filed. ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., July 1, 2016, in courtroom 3C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 14, 2016. Failure to comply with this order may result in an order to show cause why sanctions should not issue. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Sates of America
Represented By: Craig Schoenherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?