Shufelt v. Just Brakes Corporation
Plaintiff: Patricia A Shufelt
Defendant: Just Brakes Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01028
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that defendant must pay on or before 6/30/2017 $1,231.41 to Plaintiff's Counsel's Trust Account. Should the parties wish to move the currently scheduled 7/7/2017 date for the continued ENE, they must file with the court on or before 6/27/2017 a proposed stipulation and order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2017 is rescheduled for 7/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time re 11 MOTION to Dismiss re 4 Complaint. (Responses due by 5/3/2017., Replies due by 5/10/2017.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall send Plaintiff a blank USM-285 form along with a copy of this order. Upon receipt, Plaintiff must complete and sign the USM-285 form and return it to the Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of the completed USM-285 form from Plaintiff, the Clerk must deliver the summons 8 already issued, along with the USM-285,and a copy of this Court's order 7 to the U.S. Marshal for service on Just Brakes Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a USM-285 form and a proposed summons form, along with a copy of this Order. Upon re ceipt, Plaintiff must complete both forms with all required information and return them to the Clerk within thirty days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of the completed USM-285 form from Plaintiff, the Clerk of Court must issue a summon s to Just Brakes Corporation, and deliver the summons, the USM-285, a copy of 4 Plaintiff's complaint, and a copy of this Order to the U.S. Marshal for service on Just Brakes Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shufelt v. Just Brakes Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Brakes Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Shufelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?