Bank of America, N.A. v. Terraces at Rose Lake Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Terraces at Rose Lake Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01106
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting 169 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Dismissal documents due by 10/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Granting 155 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that no later than 3:00 p.m. on 8/13/2021, the HOA must either submit a settlement statement in compliance with the Courts order or file a motion explaining why it should not be required to attend the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Charito Espinosa, Engelbert Espinosa. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims for breach of NRS 116.1113, wrongful foreclosure, and injunctive relief are DISMISSED as moot pursuant to the Court's Order, (ECF No. 104 ). FURTHER ORDERED that 110 Motio n for Default Judgment against Borrowers is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 113 Motion to Stay is DENIED. The clerk of court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Stipulation for Fed R. Civ. P. 54(b) Certification. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER that 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED; 77 Countermotion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED; 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; 91 Motion for Leave t o File a Brief in Support of BANA's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot; 92 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to file a joint status report identifying whether there are any non-moot claims remaining in light of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 99 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 92 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/19/2018. Nunc Pro Tunc: December 25, 2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that 67 Motion to Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of Pending Motions for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of decision of the last currently pending motion for summary judgment in the event any of the parties' claims survive. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Remove Attorney Attorney Donna M. Wittig from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/13/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Before the court is Bank of America, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P.'s Emergency Motion for Protection from its 30(b)(6) Deposition and Motion for Sanctions (ECF Nos. [ 32], 33 ). ORDERED that: A temporary protective order is GRANTED precluding the deposition from going forward on October 27, 2016, pending a decision on the merits. A hearing on the Motions (ECF Nos. 32 , 33 ) is scheduled for 9:00 a.m., November 22, 2016, in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 10 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Terraces at Rose Lake Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraces at Rose Lake Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?