Bardes v. Silver State Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Priscilla S. Bardes
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Equity Title of Nevada, LLC, McCarthy, Holthus,, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Quality Loan Service Corp., Silver State Financial Services, U.S. Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01109
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 88 Motion for Joinder of Necessary Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 135 Motion to Amend Proof Of Service re 38 and 45 Summons Issued. The action is Dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Silver State Financial Services, Inc. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Silver State Financial Services, Inc., Recontrust Company, N.A., Old Republic Title Company of Nevada, and National Default Servicing Corporation is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that 91 Defendants' Motion to Strike 87 Plaintiff's Motion to Distinguish is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 56 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/20/2017. Motions due by 3/22/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 08/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Defend Service is Denied based upon a lack of dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 06/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bardes v. Silver State Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla S. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp.
Represented By: Aaron D Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron D Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Title of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Marilyn Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy, Holthus,
Represented By: Amanda A Hunt
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Janine C Prupas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Represented By: Amanda A Hunt
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver State Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Janine C Prupas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Janine C Prupas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?