The Bank Of New York Mellon v. Seven Hills Master Community Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Seven Hills Master Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01128
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER TO RELEASE BOND. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 57 defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 58 plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon's motion for summaryjudgment is GRANTED. The clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon and against Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1,LLC.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon's alternative damages claims against defendants Seven Hills Master Community Association and Alessi & Koenig, LLC are DISMISSED as moot. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Re: 46 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven T. Loizzi, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2018 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court GRANTS 32 the motion to extend the deadline to effectuate service on Mr. Khawam. The deadline to serve Mr. Khawam is extended by 60 days and SFR shall continue to diligently attempt to locate Mr. Khawams current address during that period. The Court DENIES without prejudice 31 the motion for service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING CASE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because of the stay, the scheduling conference set for 8/22/16 before Magistrate Judge Koppe is VACATED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a certificate of interested parties by 5/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank Of New York Mellon v. Seven Hills Master Community Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Hills Master Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?