JB Viva Vegas, L.P. v. Nevada Resort Association-IATSE Local 720 Retirement Plan
Plaintiff: JB Viva Vegas, L.P.
Defendant: Nevada Resort Association-IATSE Local 720 Retirement Plan
Case Number: 2:2016cv01130
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 27 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court is ordered to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of 27 , 28 Motions for Summary Judgment (First Request). Replies due by 11/22/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Defendant Nevada Resort Association-IATSE Local 720 Retirement Plan's 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JB Viva Vegas, L.P. v. Nevada Resort Association-IATSE Local 720 Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JB Viva Vegas, L.P.
Represented By: Beth Cyr
Represented By: Eric Field
Represented By: Lawrence Levien
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Resort Association-IATSE Local 720 Retirement Plan
Represented By: Christopher M. Humes
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?