Eltizam v. City of Las Vegas et al
Plaintiff: Nick M. Eltizam
Defendant: City of Las Vegas and Las Vegas Police Department
Case Number: 2:2016cv01178
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 35 plaintiff Nick Eltizam's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 27 defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and against plaintiff Nick M. Elitzam. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall STRIKE 16 , 26 , 31 Plaintiff's motions for relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that no later than February 15, 2017, Plaintiff must initiate a scheduling conference with Defendant, and notify the Court, in writing, when he has done so.FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with this order may result in the Court recommending dismissal of Plaintiff's case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, no later than 1/19/17, Plaintiff must initiate a scheduling conference in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eltizam v. City of Las Vegas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick M. Eltizam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?