Dryden v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Dryden
Defendant: E. Anderson, Department of Corrections, Bob Faulkner, E.K. McDaniels, CO Neilson, Osborn, State of Nevada and Assoc. Warden Bruce Stroud
Case Number: 2:2016cv01227
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation and Order to Extend the Close of Discovery and the Deadline to File a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order (ECF No. 185 ) is DENIED because the parties misstate the deadline they seek to extend. The Court refers the parties to ECF No. 175 for the correct deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting 169 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order (First Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Summary Judgment, Granting in Part Defendants' 134 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINA TE Osborn as a defendant in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to the Pro Bono Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to the magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference between Nielson and D ryden. The parties' obligation to file their joint pretrial order is STAYED until 10 days after that settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc to Pro Bono Liaison by email - HAM)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 137 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 7/25/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Re: 137 Motion for Summary Judgment, 134 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies to 134 due 14 days from date of this order. Responses to 137 due 30 days from date of this order. Replies to 137 14 days from filing Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying 145 Motion; ORDER denying 146 Motion; Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 142 Defendants Motion for an Extension of Time in which to Respond to 137 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the Court whether Plaintiff has reviewed his medical records no later than twenty (20) days after the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 129 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER denying 130 Motion for Reconsideration; Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 106 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying 107 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying 108 Motion; ORDER denying 109 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; ORDER denying 110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER denying 111 Mot ion for Temporary Restraining Order; ORDER denying 120 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying 124 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 125 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying 127 Motion to Extend Time; Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (see order for details); Plaintiff's filing at ECF No. 91 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying 78 Motion to Compel; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 66 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; ORDER granting 67 Motion to Extend Copy Work; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Order to Show Cause; ORDER denying 53 Motion; ORDER denying 56 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER denying 57 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Service must be perfected within ninety (90) days from the date of this order. Subject to the findings of the screening order (ECF No. 34), within twentyone (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court (see order for details). This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Copy Work; ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Document. The fourth-amended complaint (ECF No. 29-1) is the operative complaint in this case. Claims may proceed against (see order for details). This action is Stayed until 8/21/2018. On or before 8/21/2018, the Office of the Attorney General must file the report form attached to this order. The Attorney General's Office must advise the Court by June 11, 2018, whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of defendants. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Comp to P - JM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Time, granting 22 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Denying 10 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying without prejudice 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dryden v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Faulkner
Represented By: Tiffany E. Breinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Neilson
Represented By: Tiffany E. Breinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assoc. Warden Bruce Stroud
Represented By: Tiffany E. Breinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Dryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?