The Bank of New York Mellon v. Mesa Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Mesa Homeowners Association, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01239
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the County Recorder for Clark County, Nevada is directed to expunge the notice of lis pendens recorded by Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC on the property located a t 6947 Dancing Cloud Avenue, Henderson, NV 89011; APN 161-35-213-111. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation of Dismissal; Defendants Mesa Homeowners Association, and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC as Defendant and Counterclaimant are Dismissed as is BNY Mellon as Counter Defendant. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Stipulation to Continue Stay. Status Report due within 90 days. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Stay Re: 65 Minute Order. Joint Status Report within 90 days. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven T. Loizzi, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Mesa Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?