Fresquez v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Fresquez, Jr.
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01274
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Plaintiff's 1 -2 Complaint is Dismissed with prejudice for failure to abide by the orders of the Court and failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Defendants Nationstar and US Bank's 41 Motion to Enforce Settlement. Parties have either 28 days to submit a signed and executed settlement agreement or Plaintiff must vacate the property within 30 days of being tendered pay ment of the $5,000.00 (failure to do so will result in the Court granting the motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute). Defendants Nationstar and US Bank's 43 Second Motion to Dismiss is Denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC's 3 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is Granted leave to amend his Complaint. The Amended Complaint must be filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s Response due by 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time (First Request) to File Reply to 3 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Replies due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresquez v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Fresquez, Jr.
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Rebekkah B Bodoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Alayne M. Opie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?