The Board Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Health And Welfare Trust, et al. v. FF&E Logistical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Board Of Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Health And Welfare Trust, The Board Of Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Joint Pension Trust, The Board Of Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Vacation Trust and The Board of Trustees Of Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Defendant: FF&E Logistical, Inc. and Robert C. Patten
Case Number: 2:2016cv01289
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER for Judgment Debtor Examination. Robert L. Ansara shall appear on 9/6/2017 at 10:00 a.m. at The Urban Law Firm located at 4270 South Decatur Blvd., Suite A-9, Las Vegas, NV 89103. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. With respect to the judgment debtor examination itself, the Court Grants that aspect of the motion as unopposed. Plaintiffs shall file a new proposed order by 8/4/2017. The motion for an order compelling the production of documents is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the amount of $116,940.61. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Eric D. Hone for Defendants FF&E Logistical, Inc. and Robert Patton. Defendant FF&E Logistical, Inc. is to retain new counsel and for that new counsel to file a notice of appearance by 2/8/2017. Defendant Robert Patton is to file by 2/8/2017 either (1) a notice that he intends to proceed pro se or (2) a notice of appearance by newly retained counsel. The Clerk's Office is to update the docket with Defendants' addresses as listed at 17 page 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order mailed to Defendants - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Health And Welfare Trust, et al. v. FF&E Logistical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FF&E Logistical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board Of Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Health And Welfare Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board Of Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Joint Pension Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board Of Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Vacation Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees Of Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?