Hancock Sandblast & Paint LLC v. Drax, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Sandblast & Paint LLC
Defendant: Drax, Inc. and Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv01326
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to Stay the Proceeding Pending Arbitration and to Refer all Issues to Arbitration. The Clerk of Court is directed to STAY (and administratively close) THIS CASE pending arbitration. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Hancock Sandblast & Paint LLC by Adam S. Heder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 33 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 12/8/2016. The Court has received Defendant Drax's motion for a subpoena 28 . Upon review, the court will GRANT the motion. A signed copy of the subpoena is attached to this order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Sandblast & Paint LLC v. Drax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Sandblast & Paint LLC
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lloyd
Represented By: Marisa L Maskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?