Ditech Financial LLC v. Sunrise Mountain Townhomes Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Defendant: 7066 Burcot E59 Trust, Alessi & Koenig, LLC and Sunrise Mountain Townhomes Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01415
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 46 the Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Sunrise Mountain Townhomes Homeowners Association, Inc. answer due 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Regardless of this stay, the plaintiff shall timely serve process upon the defendants and file proof of service. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 08/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Parties to Certify Cases to Nevada Attorney General. Proof of compliance due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC v. Sunrise Mountain Townhomes Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7066 Burcot E59 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Mountain Townhomes Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Represented By: Tanya N. Peters
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?