Gore v. Citizens One Home Loans et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Gore
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association, Citizens One Home Loans, Equifax Information Services, LLC. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01562
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Bank of America, National Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 parties' joint interim status report. A joint interim status report that complies with Local Rule 26-3, is due no later than 12/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5 re 17 Stipulation re Discovery Matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore v. Citizens One Home Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens One Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Gore
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?