Topolewski et al v. Blyschak et al
Plaintiff: Metal Jeans, Inc., Gary Topolewski and Bud Zukaloff
Defendant: Paula Blyschak, Vivian Cheung, Lee A. Cowley, Cowley and Company Law Firm, Amir A. Fazel, Tim Kilbrai, Andrea Mosher, Jacqui Ross, Aman Wallia and Joshua Woods
Case Number: 2:2016cv01588
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 97 Blyschak's motion to amend judgment is DENIED; 99 Plaintiff Metal Jeans, Inc.'s motion to strike is DENIED as moot; 92 Kilbrai's motion for $38,772 in attorney's fees is GRANTED; and [93 ] the Cowley defendants' motion for $23,843.90 in attorneys' fees is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Tim Kilbrai and against Gary Topolewski, Bud Zukaloff, and Metal Jeans, Inc. in the amount of $38,122. The Clerk of Court is also directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Lee A. Cowley, Joshua Woods, Vivian Cheung, Amir A. Fazel, Aman Wallia, Jacqui Ross, Andrea Mosher, and Cowley and Company Law Firm (the Cowley defendants) and against Gary Topolewski, Bud Zukaloff, and Metal Jeans, Inc. in the total amount of $23,843.90. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re 102 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Court hereby SETS a hearing on that motion for 3:00 p.m. on 6/5/17, in Courtroom 3B. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ny response to the motion to withdraw shall befiled no later than 6/2/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than 5/30/17, Mr. Hansen shall serve Metal Jeans with this order and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 69 plaintiff'smotion for entry of Clerks Default is DENIED, 71 plaintiffs motion for extension of time is DENIED as moot, and 80 Blyschak's motion to dismiss isGRANTED. All cla ims against Blyschak are dismissed without prejudice under FRCP 4(m) and based on plaintiff's failure to comply with my 11/7/16, order to show cause. Because the dismissal of the claims against Blyschak ends this case, the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 52 , 53 defendants' motions for attorneys fees are DENIED without prejudice. Defendants have until 4/4/17, to file renewed motions for attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation to Extend Time re 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. ( Replies due by 12/23/2016.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Extend Time re 11 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/7/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 31 Stipulation to Delay Initial Disclosures. ( Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/30/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Time re 12 MOTION to Quash or Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. Responses due by 9/8/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Tim Kilbrai answer due 8/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Topolewski et al v. Blyschak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Blyschak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Cheung
Represented By: John H. Cotton
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee A. Cowley
Represented By: John H. Cotton
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowley and Company Law Firm
Represented By: John H. Cotton
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir A. Fazel
Represented By: John H. Cotton
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Kilbrai
Represented By: Liane S. Binowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Mosher
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqui Ross
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aman Wallia
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Woods
Represented By: Katherine A. Manthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metal Jeans, Inc.
Represented By: Joel F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Topolewski
Represented By: Joel F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Zukaloff
Represented By: Joel F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?