Nichols et al v. City of Henderson et al
Plaintiff: Joshua I Nichols and Nadine Nichols
Defendant: City of Henderson, Henderson Police Department and Patrick E. Moers
Case Number: 2:2016cv01611
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendant L. Theobald. As all defendants have been dismissed in this action, the clerk of court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that 4 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Joshua I. Nichols' claims brought on behalf of his wife, Nadine Nichols, be DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of standing. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall terminate Plaintiff Nadine Nichols from this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), the Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, Di strict of Nevada, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiffs account (inmate #89141), in the months that the account exceeds $10.00, until the full $400 (which includes the $350 filing fee and $50 administrative fee) filing fees have been paid for this action. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the attention of the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed witho ut prejudicewith leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until September 29, 2017 to file an amended complaintcorrecting the noted deficiencies as they related to the City of Henderson, the Henderson PoliceDepartment, Police Chief Patrick E. Moers and t he Defendant Officers in their official capacity. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Officers, in their individual capacity, may proceed once Plaintiff is able to properly identify them. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's Complaint. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's claims brought on behalf of his wife, Nadine Nichols, be dismissed with prejudice for lack of standing. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols et al v. City of Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick E. Moers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua I Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?