Zambrano v. Cardenas Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Felicitas Zambrano
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01659
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that the Court sets a telephonic hearing at which the terms of the settlement will be placed on the record. The hearing is set for 12/6/2017 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. As to the substance of the motion, the Court will Grant it and Reopen the mediator's compromise previously proposed until 4:00 p.m. on 12/5/2018. Counsel shall fax chambers whether they accept or decline that compromise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Motion to Change Settlement Conference Start Time. Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Defendant's 31 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment are Denied as moot. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff chooses not to file a second amended complaint this case will continue with respect to the claim not dismissed by this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re Plaintiff's 20 Amended Motion to Compel Discovery, or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Amend the Complaint. The Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file and serve the Amended Complaint by 12/9/2016. The Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Plaintiff's 21 Objection is OVERRULED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying 17 Stipulation without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation re Rule 35 Examination of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zambrano v. Cardenas Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicitas Zambrano
Represented By: Alex De Castroverde
Represented By: Kimberly Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?