Bank of America, N.A. v. Maravilla Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Maravilla Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01663
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Re: 28 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Certifying Cases to Nevada Attorney General. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada, via certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: copy of order sent via certified mail to AG in Carson City and Las Vegas, NV - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Maravilla Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maravilla Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?