O v. Flynn Group, Inc. a/d/b/a Keith Flynn Everton
Plaintiff: Mel O
Defendant: Flynn Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01712
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 7/28/2017., Motions due by 8/28/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2017; denying 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 25 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, 26 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 5/5/2017., Replies due by 5/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Mel O Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Set Aside 9 Clerk's Default. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O v. Flynn Group, Inc. a/d/b/a Keith Flynn Everton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flynn Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel O
Represented By: Maile Lani Esteban-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?