Cave v. JPM Chase Bank Investments Division et al
Plaintiff: Chris Harold Cave
Defendant: JPM Chase Bank Investments Division, MERS Corp, National Default Servicing Corporation and Tiffany & Bosco Firm, P.A., LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01806
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Strike 37 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 26 Plaintiff's Petition to R-12(f) Strike Attorney-Hearsay per Perjured Plain-False and Not-True Testiphony, Proffered to Craft Tactical False Narratives is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that 27 Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Production of Answers toInterrogatories is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that 25 Plaintiff's Petition to Enter R-903; 901(4-6) and 902, Self- Authenticating Repudiating Evidence Just in Case, onto this Courts Docket and Records is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Strike 10 Plaintiff's Ex Officio Clerk Petition to Adduce and Enter Exhibits on Record, and 12 Plaintiff's Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Stay Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay of discovery will automatically lift upon the Court's denial of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 13 in whole or in part. The parties shall have fourtee n (14) days from the entry of an order denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Notice of Removal is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that 11 Motion for Review of In Forma Pauperis Status is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until thirty (30) days from the date of this order to submit a completed application and affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cave v. JPM Chase Bank Investments Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Harold Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPM Chase Bank Investments Division
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Bosco Firm, P.A., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?