Tolliver v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: George A Tolliver
Defendant: Karly McCormack, Nevada Department of Corrections, James Ozurenda and Gustavo Sanchez
Case Number: 2:2016cv01807
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that 7 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as t he document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than September 5, 2017, Plaintiff shall either file a completed ifp application or pay the full filing fee. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. FURTHER ORDERED that upon the resolution of the matter of the filing fee this Court shall issue a subsequent order on the matter of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Amending 17 Order Scheduling Inmate Early Mediation Conference. An Inmate Early Mediation Conference is set for 7/28/2017 at 11:15 AM in Room 3054. J. Michael McGroarty, ESQ. has been appointed as the mediator in this case. The inmate early mediation is continued in time only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend Time. Limited Notice of Appearance due 6/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Extend Time. No later than 9/30/2016, Plaintiff shall either pay filing fee in full or file a complete IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolliver v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karly McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ozurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?