Hannon v. Northeast Credit & Collections et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael J. Hannon |
Defendant: |
Aargon Agency, Inc., Bank of America, National Association, CIT Bank, National Association, Cach, LLC, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC, Northeast Credit & Collections, Plusfour, Inc. and Trans Union, LLC. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01814 |
Filed: |
July 29, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Nature of Suit: |
Consumer Credit |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 11, 2018 |
Filing
103
ORDER Granting in part Plaintiff's 94 Motion for Clarification and Denying Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
89
ORDER Granting Experian's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Hannon's 62 , 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Experian and against Hannon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
88
ORDER Granting Experian's 84 Motion to Seal 74 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
83
ORDER Granting in part Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Seal. The Sealed 67 Motion shall remain sealed pending further order of the Court. Plaintiff's 72 Motion to Seal is Denied without prejudice. If a Motion to seal regarding 73 and 74 is not filed within 14 days of the date of this order Plaintiff's 74 Response will be unsealed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 7, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 04/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS. This case is Dismissed without prejudice only as to Defendants Northeast Credit & Collections and JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
46
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 26, 2016 |
Filing
35
ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Cach, LLC with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
26
ORDER Denying as moot 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 1 Complaint. PlusFour, Inc. was dismised on 9/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Hannon v. Northeast Credit & Collections et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Aargon Agency, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CIT Bank, National Association |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Cach, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Northeast Credit & Collections |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Plusfour, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Michael J. Hannon |
Represented By: |
David H. Krieger |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?