Campbell v. Las Vegas Bistro, LLC dba Larry Flynt's Hustler Club
Plaintiff: Brandi Campbell
Defendant: Las Vegas Bistro, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01842
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 38 the joint motion to approve the settlement and dismiss the case with prejudice be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 10 defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Seal. (See Order for Details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 21 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Las Vegas Bistro, LLC dba Larry Flynt's Hustler Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Campbell
Represented By: Robert P Spretnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Bistro, LLC
Represented By: Phillip C Thompson
Represented By: Elayna J Youchah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?