Williams v. Nevens et al
Petitioner: Christopher B Williams
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Dwight Nevens
Case Number: 2:2016cv01843
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 15 this action is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 respondents' motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that petitioner shall file and serve a notice of change of address within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is expressly advised that failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 12 respondents' motion for leave to file a late motion for extension of time and 13 motion or extension of time to file a responsive pleading are both GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Nevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight Nevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher B Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?