KJH & RDA Investor Group, LLC v. Turnberry/MGM Grand Towers, LLC
Appellant: KJH & RDA Investor Group, LLC
Appellee: Turnberry/MGM Grand Towers, LLC
Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2016cv01863
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. In light of the parties' progress on settlement as reflected in this stipulation, 8 the briefing schedule is VACATED. The parties shall appear for a STATUS CHECK on 2/6/17 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George U. S. Cour thouse, 333 Las Vegas, Blvd. So. If settlement is completed before that time, the stipulation and order to dismiss should include the language the Clerk of Court is instructed to vacate all hearings and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation. Opening brief due by 12/14/2016. Answering brief due by 1/13/2017. Reply brief due by 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KJH & RDA Investor Group, LLC v. Turnberry/MGM Grand Towers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KJH & RDA Investor Group, LLC
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Thomas H. Fell
Represented By: Robert B. Gerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Turnberry/MGM Grand Towers, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E Garman
Represented By: Talitha Gray Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?