Jackson v. Newton et al
Plaintiff: Lionell Jackson
Defendant: Newton and Sanchez
Case Number: 2:2016cv01864
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 47 Second Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/11/2018. Motions due by 11/12/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Responses due by 5/22/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Cory Newton. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to provide to the U.S. Marshal the required USM-285 form with the required information as to Defendant Newton. The Clerk's Office shall issue a summons for Defendant Newton and deliver the same to the U.S. Marshal with the address provided under seal for service. Docket No. 21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Complaint, Summons, 21 and this Order hand delivered to USM; Complaint, USM 285 Form, and this Order mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 34 Motion for Clarification and 35 Motion to Extend Time. Responses shall be filed by 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Letter. The Clerk's Office shall re-send the 30 Scheduling Order to Plaintiff's address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - clerk remailed 30 - SLD)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 9 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 15 Motion to accept service; Service must be perfected within 90 days from the date of this Order; Subject to the findings of the 21 screening order, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney Generals Office shall file a notice advising the Court (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance, 11 to Atty General - JM)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Court amends the 13 Order Scheduling Inmate Early Mediation Conference to reflect that Robert P. Spretnak, Esq. has been appointed as the mediator in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiff's 7 Letter is construed as a motion for extension of time. The Court Grants the motion for an extension of time. Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pa y the full $400 fee for filing a civil action by 11/18/2016. No further extensions will be granted. If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Newton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionell Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?