RH Kids, LLC v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RH Kids, LLC
Defendant: Howard D. Fielden, Patsy S. Fielden, Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01894
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation to Remand to the Eighth Judicial District Court of Clark County, Nevada. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy of Order and docket sheet mailed to State Court - SLD)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulation; Re: 30 Motion to Remand to State Court, 27 Motion to Stay Case., Responses for 30 Motion due by 1/19/2018. Replies for 27 and 30 Motions due by 2/2/2018. Briefing Schedule for dispositive motions extended to 2/2/2018. Parties shall file a status report with the Court no later than Friday, January 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Extend Remaining Briefing Deadlines on All Pending Motions (First Request). Defendant's Response to 30 Motion to Remand due by 12/1/2017. Replies to 27 , 28 , and 30 Motions due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233. Once exhaustion occurs any party may move to lift the stay. All pending motions are Denied without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. Beginning 3/21/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RH Kids, LLC v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard D. Fielden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy S. Fielden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: Christian A Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: Christian A Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH Kids, LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Beede
Represented By: Cheryl A. Grames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?