The Bank of New York Mellon v. Stone Canyon West Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Stone Canyon West Homeowners Association
Unknown: Christine M. Parvan
Case Number: 2:2016cv01904
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. SFR's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Stipulation re Notices of Rule 30(b)(6); Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA, 832 F.3d 1154 (9th Cir. 2016). All pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within 21 days after the stay is lifted. Beginning on 9/18/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every 180 days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Cross Claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 44 Motion for Service by Publication of Cross-Defendant Juan A. Chacon. SFR's 45 Motion to Extend Time is Granted and the time for service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date of this Order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Remove Attorney Christine M. Parvan from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Stone Canyon West Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Canyon West Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Rebekkah B Bodoff
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Christine M. Parvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?