LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-18
Case Number: 2:2016cv01918
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that LHF's objection to Magistrate Judge Koppes report and recommendation is OVERRULED and Magistrate Judge Koppes report and 47 recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that 55 LHF's motion for default judgment is DENIED as moot with respect to Gallego, Gyarfas, Templeton, and Walsh and GRANTED with respect to Boughton. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of LHF Productions, Inc. and against Derrick Boughton in the total amount of $9,050 and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant John Werber. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying 49 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned RECOMMENDS in this case that all Defendants except Defendant Derek Boughton be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this report and recommendation, as we ll as the order and report and recommendation issued concurrently herewith in LHF Productions, Inc. v. Kabala, Case No. 2:16-cv-02028-JAD-NJK, on any defendant who has not yet appeared, and shall file a proof of service of the same by 6/20/2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the pending order to show cause 30 is hereby DISCHARGED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 44 Plaintiff's motion for a hearing is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 28 , 30 Orders to Show Cause. To the extent any defendant wishes to do so, he may file a response to the orders to show cause at by 5/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a declaration whether the Rule 26(f) conference was held as required and, if so, why a discovery plan has not been filed. That declaration shall be filed by 5/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that this case is transferred to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy Koppe for all further proceedings. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:16-cv-01918-JAD-NJK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a copy of this order in any future case that it files in this district that is related to the London Has Fallen copyright. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 4/24/2017 to correct case number reflected docket (ADR). Modified on 4/24/2017 to reflect correct Judge assignment(ADR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?