Saterstad v. Drug Enforcement Administration
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Saterstad
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Case Number: 2:2016cv01947
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Hoffman's 13 Report and Recommendation is accepted. Plaintiff Richard Lee Saterstad's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER granting 9 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Vacating 11 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 5 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending to dismiss 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the pending 8 Report and Recommendation is VACATED. The pending motion to proceed in forma pauperis will be considered at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's case be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of filing fees or IFP due 10/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saterstad v. Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Saterstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?