Moreira-Brown v. Las Vegas Review Journal Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Moreira-Brown
Defendant: April Ademiluyi, Las Vegas Review Journal Inc. and Carri Geer Thevenot
Case Number: 2:2016cv02002
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Dismiss.; granting 73 Motion for Leave to File.; granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss.; Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that 60 and 62 Motions to Stay are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Motion to Expedite the Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that 66 Motion for an Order Compelling Defendants to Identify Jane Doe is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 11:00 a.m., October 23, 2017, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. The Clerk of Court is directed to email a copy of this order to Mr. Moreira-Brown at jmgluck200@aol.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER scheduling Discovery Hearing for 5/4/2017 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The hearing will be vacated upon the filing of the discovery plan and scheduling order in compliance with Local Rule 26-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Extension of Time re 34 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/31/2017. Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Default Judgment is Denied. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 3/27/2017, Plaintiff must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial. Upon timely filing of the certification, Plaintiff shall contact the CM/ECF Help Desk at (702) 464-5555 to set up a CM/ECF account. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that 23 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Service; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Extend Time. FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 1/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Defendant Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 3/6/2017, Defendant must provide certification that she has completed the CM/ECF tutorial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Service; denying 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Extend Time re 7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/21/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1, no later than 4:00 p.m. on September 23, 2016. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreira-Brown v. Las Vegas Review Journal Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Ademiluyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Review Journal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carri Geer Thevenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Moreira-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?