Birkan v. Seterus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Birkan
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC., Federal National Mortgage Association A/K/A Fannie Mae, Innovis Data Solutions, Inc., Seterus, Inc. and Toyota Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv02060
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the above-entitled action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice as to defendant Toyota Financial Services. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case, as there are no remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 29 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation of Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Seterus, Inc. answer due 11/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation To Extend Seterus, Inc.'s Time to Respond To Complaint. Answer due 11/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation To Extend Seterus, Inc.'s Time To Respond To Complaint (First Request) re 1 Complaint. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation For Extension of Time For Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC To File Answer re 1 Complaint. Responses due by 11/5/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birkan v. Seterus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Birkan
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association A/K/A Fannie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovis Data Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?