Duda v. Williams Sr et al
Petitioner: Chester j Duda
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E Williams Sr
Case Number: 2:2016cv02108
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 4 , 11 the petition is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 38 petitioner's motion for reconsideration is DENIED as moot. Respondents have until 4/8/19, to answer the remaining grounds. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to SEND a copy of 35 the order to petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner must comply with the order at ECF No. 35 by 3/8/19, or this case may be dismissed without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 36 petitioner's motion for status check is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 31 petitioner's motion to extend copywork limit is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 27 , 34 petitioner's motions for stay and abeyance are DENIED. Status Report due by 10/22/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 14 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part. See Order for further deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 18 Duda'smotion for extension of time is GRANTED in part: Duda's time to file and serve his response to 14 the respondents' motion to dismiss is EXTENDED to 6/27/17. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 8 Duda's motion to supplement petition is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to detach and separately FILE the attachmentat ECF No. 8 -1 as a statement of additional claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents must file their response to the petition, including the statement of additional claims, by 4/3/17. The 11/1/16, scheduling order remains in effect in all other respects. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying without prejudice 6 Motion to add, amend, or supplement additional claims. If Duda wishes to file a new motion to amend/supplement, he must do so by 12/21/2016, and he must attach the proposed amended petition or statement of additional claims to the motion. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to FILE and electronically SERVE 1 -1 Duda's petition on respondents and add Adam Paul Laxalt, Nevada Attorney General, as counsel for respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents must respond to the petition by 1/31/17. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/1/2016) (ADR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duda v. Williams Sr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E Williams Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chester j Duda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?