Federal National Mortgage Association v. Terra Cotta II Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, CSC Acquisition & Holdings LLC, EQ Partners Solutions, LLC and Terra Cotta II Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02152
Filed: September 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Shane D. Cox withdrawn from the case. ; Defendant's Attorney designation deadline: 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that, absent leave for an extension being granted, the response to a discovery motion shall be filed within 4 days of the service of that motion and any reply shall be filed within 2 days of the service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; Within 60 days of the date of this order, the parties shall meet and confer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 7 Notice re 4m Dismissal, CSC Acquisition & Holdings LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Terra Cotta II Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSC Acquisition & Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQ Partners Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Cotta II Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?